Lom, Jitka (CPSO#: 65309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
302 South Route 4
Hagatna GM  96932
United States
Phone: 6476467884
Fax: 6476467884

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Guam

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JITKA LOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016