Lomaga, Mark Andrew (CPSO#: 81037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DermEdge
333 Lakeshore Road West
Suite 102
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Phone: (905) 274-9999
Fax: (905) 274-9991
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lomaga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 13 2015


Corporation Name: Mark Lomaga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lomaga ( CPSO# 81037 )

Business Address:
Port Credit Wellness Centre
Suite 102
333 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Phone Number: (905) 274-9999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ANDREW LOMAGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOMAGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009