Londei-Leduc, Luc (CPSO#: 107460)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kingston General Hospital 76 Stuart Street Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016