Long, Barry Herbert (CPSO#: 28078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 404
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 465-2556
Fax: (416) 465-3033
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry H. Long Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Long ( CPSO# 28078 )

Business Address:
Suite 404
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 465-2556

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY HERBERT LONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1976