Long, Briar Allyn (CPSO#: 71670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
J T Powell Building
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone: (519) 824-4120 Ext. 52131
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAR ALLYN LONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003