Longford, Ulic Dalzell Burnet Hinkson (CPSO#: 20680)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malay

Education:University of Dublin, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 18 Jan 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 29, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Ulic Dalzell Burnet Hinkson Longford to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

I, Dr. Ulic Dalzell B.H. Longford:

(2) Acknowledge and agree that the College referred allegations of my incapacity to the Fitness to Practise Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated January 16, 2012 (the “Notice of Hearing”).
(3) Acknowledge and agree that, in exchange for an original copy of this Undertaking as executed by me, the College has agreed to withdraw the Notice of Hearing.
(4) Acknowledge that I am the subject of investigations by the College, including an investigation under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (the “Investigations”) regarding whether I have committed acts of professional misconduct or am incompetent in the practice of medicine.
(5) Acknowledge that allegations regarding acts of professional misconduct have not been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of my standard of practice.
(6) Hereby resign from the College effective June 29th, 2012 (the “Effective Date”).
(7) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(8) Agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I am in breach of this Undertaking the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the allegations regarding incapacity set out in the Notice of Hearing and/or to re-commence the Investigations it terminated as a result of this Undertaking.
(14) Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.