Longley, Catherine Dawn (CPSO#: 70022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1276A Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6L-7W5
Canada
Phone: 905-849-8646
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Longley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Longley ( CPSO# 70022 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Emergency Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5095

Business Address:
1276 Cornwall Road
Unit A
Oakville ON  L6J 7W5
Phone Number: (905) 849-8646

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE DAWN LONGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LONGLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1998