Lonn, Eva Marcu (CPSO#: 55228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hebrew, Romanian

Education:The Hebrew University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 526-0970
Fax: (905) 577-8261
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd East, Suite 2
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 232-5545
Fax: (905) 232-5546
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Lonn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lonn ( CPSO# 55228 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 526-0970

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVA MARCU LONN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LONN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1990