Looi-Lyons, Chui Lian (CPSO#: 61231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Looi-Lyons Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Looi-Lyons ( CPSO# 61231 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7628

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHUI LIAN LOOI-LYONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOOI-LYONS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990