Lopes, Anthony Damian (CPSO#: 24890)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Oct 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Oct 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Oct 1994