Lopez Alonso, Jose Oscar (CPSO#: 89730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 726-2994
Fax: (705) 726-1069
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

480 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 792-0933
Fax: (705) 792-0966
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

201 Georgian Dr
RVH
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jose O. Lopez Alonso Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lopez Alonso ( CPSO# 89730 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 241-6226

Business Address:
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-0933

Business Address:
301 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 725-0885

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSE OSCAR LOPEZ ALONSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ ALONSO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2008 to 30 Oct 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2008 to 07 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2009 to 07 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2010 to 07 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2011