Lopez, Carlos Andres (CPSO#: 84331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C110 - 2230 Lakeshore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON  M8V 0B2
Phone: (647) 748-9444
Fax: (647) 748-9344
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carlos A. Lopez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lopez ( CPSO# 84331 )

Business Address:
10 - 2230 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 0B2
Phone Number: (647) 748-9444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLOS ANDRES LOPEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012