Lopez, Pedro Guarionex (CPSO#: 52192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Names: Lopez Panningua, Pedro Guarionex (used until: 24 Aug 1993 )     Lopez Paniagua, Pedro Guarionex (used until: 15 Jun 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
health sciences north cancer centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-6237 Ext. 2320
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. G. Lopez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lopez ( CPSO# 52192 )
Dr. M. Lamarre ( CPSO# 51116 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-6237

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay General Hospital,Civic Site North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PEDRO GUARIONEX LOPEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1984