Lopez-Vidriero Tejedor, Emilio (CPSO#: 89771)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University Complutense of Madrid, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Aug 2008 to 16 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Sep 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010