Lorberg, Gunter Wolfgang (CPSO#: 72223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Central North Correctional Centre
1501 Fuller Avenue
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 2H4
Phone: (705) 549-9470
Fax: (705) 549-5124
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Clinic
20 Owen Street
Barrie ON  L4M 3G7
Canada
Phone: (705) 730-0286
Fax: (705) 730-0287
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lorberg ( CPSO# 72223 )

Business Address:
Central North Correctional Centre
1501 Fuller Avenue
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 2G2
Phone Number: (705) 549-9470

Business Address:
Barrie Clinic
20 Owen Street
Barrie ON  L4M 3G7
Phone Number: (705) 730-0286

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUNTER WOLFGANG LORBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004