Lorenzana Pineda, Adonis Napoleon (CPSO#: 64836)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Honduras, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Nov 1996