Lorimer, John Wilson (CPSO#: 58790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Surgery
Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road, Room W1608
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8428
Fax: (613) 737-8371
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Lorimer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lorimer ( CPSO# 58790 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Site
Department of Surgery
Room W1608
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 05 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 5, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Wilson Lorimer
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Lorimer to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                        DR. JOHN WILSON LORIMER
                                            ("Dr. Lorimer")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Lorimer, certificate of registration number 58790, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Lorimer, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 107286 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct in my surgical practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Lorimer, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lorimer, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   individualized instruction in communications satisfactory to
                              the
                              College, with an instructor selected by the College; and
                  
                        (ii)  review and preparation of a written summary of the following
                              College policies, to be submitted to the instructor selected
                              by the College:
                  
            1.    The Practice Guide; and

            2.    Consent to Treatment

                  (b)   I, Dr. Lorimer, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of attendance and a report from the instructor, within one
                        (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will
                        determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lorimer, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided directly by the instructor to the College regarding my
                        progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lorimer, undertake to complete the Professional Education by
                        June 30, 2018 or, if no satisfactory instructor is available by
                        that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (6)   I, Dr. Lorimer, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Lorimer, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Lorimer, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (9)   I, Dr. Lorimer, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (10)  I, Dr. Lorimer, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (11)  I, Dr. Lorimer, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (12)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lorimer, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lorimer, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Lorimer engaged in professional misconduct in his surgical
                              practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Lorimer will engage in professional education in
                              Communications.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Lorimer, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (14)  I, Dr. Lorimer, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Lorimer, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking;
                  and/or  

                  (c)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 5, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Wilson Lorimer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 5, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Lorimer engaged in professional misconduct in his surgical practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Lorimer will engage in professional education in Communications.