Lortie, Melissa Sonia (CPSO#: 89359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Lortie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lortie ( CPSO# 89359 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
100 - 2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone Number: (613) 830-1298

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA SONIA LORTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORTIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010