Losada, Diana (CPSO#: 96796)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CPC Building Suite 327 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K7Y 4E9
Date Received: 16 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 26 Sep 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2014