Lossing, Alan Glenn (CPSO#: 32134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 953-8787
Fax: (905) 953-0330
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lossing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lossing ( CPSO# 32134 )

Business Address:
101 - 16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 953-8787

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN GLENN LOSSING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOSSING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1983