Lotenero, Carrie Lynn (CPSO#: 105752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 May 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Lake Erie College of Osteopathic Medicin, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 05 May 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 May 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Carrie  Lynn  Lotenero  may  practise  medicine independently in emergency
            medicine.