Lotfi-Seysan, Lotfullah (CPSO#: 70861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek, Persian

Education:University of Athens, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carbonear General Hospital
86 Highroad South
Carbonear NL  A1Y 1A4
Phone: (790) 945-6555
Fax: (709) 945-5181
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 1- 700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Canada
Phone: 519-258-4515
Fax: 519-258-6247
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Amiha Diagnostic Imaging
45 St. Thomas Street
St. Albert AB  T8N 6Z1
Canada
Phone: (780) 470-5551
County: 
Electoral District: 

#11 - 279 Wharncliffe Rd North
London ON  N6H 2C2
Canada
Phone: (519) 661-0275
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOTFULLAH LOTFI-SEYSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOTFI-SEYSAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1996