Lotfy, Khaled Hany Abdelsalam (CPSO#: 91225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
Nephrology Department
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALED HANY ABDELSALAM LOTFY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LOTFY is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. LOTFY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LOTFY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LOTFY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LOTFY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LOTFY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018