Loubani, Eman Mahmoud (CPSO#: 89648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital, LHSC
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52011
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eman Loubani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Loubani ( CPSO# 89648 )

Business Address:
The Children's Hospital HLSC
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Comissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMAN MAHMOUD LOUBANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUBANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2008 to 28 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2009