Lough, Rodney Darren (CPSO#: 67068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36775
Fax: (905) 381-5607
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rod Lough Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lough ( CPSO# 67068 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
100 West 5th Street
Room W265P
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RODNEY DARREN LOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993