Lougheed, Jane (CPSO#: 66799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2390
Fax: (613) 738-4835
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Lougheed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lougheed ( CPSO# 66799 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE LOUGHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUGHEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Nov 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1997