Lougheed, Mary-Lynne Lydia (CPSO#: 23820)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Axler, Mary-Lynne Lydia (used until: 26 Jun 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 807 Broawdview Avenue Toronto ON M4K 2P8 416.461.9471
Instructions: Patients who saw Dr. Lougheed at the Albany Clinic may contact the clinic directly at the address noted above. Patients who saw Dr. Lougheed outside of the Albany Clinic may call her directly at 705.342.1476 to discuss medical record accomodations.
Date Received: 05 Feb 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009