Louie, Brian Edward (CPSO#: 77791)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 May 2007