Louie, Gorman (CPSO#: 56563)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2000


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2000