Louie, Marie (CPSO#: 60575)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 06 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 01 Dec 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2004