Louis-Bayliss, Amy Genevieve (CPSO#: 88310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

125 Lakeshore Rd E.
Mississauga ON  L5G 1E5
Canada
Phone: 905 274 4440
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Louis-Bayliss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Louis-Bayliss ( CPSO# 88310 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY GENEVIEVE LOUIS-BAYLISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUIS-BAYLISS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 14 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011