Loukras, Lucinda Jane (CPSO#: 58835)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Loukras, Cindy Jane (used until: 31 Jul 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L.J. Loukras Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 20 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013