Louvaris, James Hyman (CPSO#: 67102)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9
9000 Weston Road
Vaughan ON  L4L 1A6
Phone: (905) 417-2273
Fax: (905) 605-1793
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES HYMAN LOUVARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUVARIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1999