Louw, Deon Francois (CPSO#: 68650)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009