Lovatsis, Danny (CPSO#: 70614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Lawrence and Frances Bloomberg
Ontario Power Generation Building
700 University Avenue Room 8 - 814
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4566
Fax: (416) 586-3152
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANNY LOVATSIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVATSIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Aug 1996
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 1997 to 12 Mar 1997
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 08 May 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 18 Dec 1997 to 11 Mar 1998
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002