Love Jones, Helen (CPSO#: 26095)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: Cole, Helen Love (used until: 11 Jun 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Welsh National School of Medicine, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006