Loveday, Benjamin Douglas (CPSO#: 81105)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CMHA Middlesex - Strathroy Site
21 Richmond Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 2Z1
Phone: 226-374-6545
Fax: 226-316-0298
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN DOUGLAS LOVEDAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVEDAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 14 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 15 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Dec 2006 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Dec 2008 to 15 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009