Lovrics, Peter John (CPSO#: 59569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
8th Floor
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6060
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lovrics Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lovrics ( CPSO# 59569 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
G802 - 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOHN LOVRICS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVRICS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1990