Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Low, Aaron Ay-Lunn (CPSO#: 67863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2425 Eglinton Ave East
Suite 12
Toronto ON  M1K 5G8
Phone: (416) 7577117
Fax: (416) 7577376
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Low Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Low ( CPSO# 67863 )

Business Address:
2425 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1K 5G8
Phone Number: (416) 757-7117

Business Address:
1256 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 1E5
Phone Number: (416) 261-3500

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON AY-LUNN LOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1996