Low, Donald Edward (CPSO#: 52160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Virgina Mason Clinic
Section Of Gen & Thoracic Surgery
1100 Ninth Avenue , Box 900
Seattle WA  98111
United States
Phone: (206) 223-6164
Fax: (206) 625-7245

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD EDWARD LOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1984