Low, Graeme Longden (CPSO#: 21702)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009