Low, James Percival (CPSO#: 52443)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. Low has suggested that any patients looking for medical records should contact their family physician
Date Received: 27 Jan 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006