Lowcock, Donald Gordon (CPSO#: 30284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone: (519) 753-8666
Fax: (519) 753-6880
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Downie, Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Thompson ( CPSO# 54979 )
Dr. C. Roye ( CPSO# 61763 )
Dr. D. Lowcock ( CPSO# 30284 )
Dr. D. Downie ( CPSO# 64176 )
Dr. K. Bates ( CPSO# 50121 )
Dr. C. Cowan ( CPSO# 60712 )

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666


Corporation Name: D.G. Lowcock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lowcock ( CPSO# 30284 )

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD GORDON LOWCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOWCOCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1978