Lowe, Alan David (CPSO#: 61298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Branson Site 2 North
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 632-8701 Ext. 6035
Fax: (416) 632-8718
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ellesmere Sleep Disorders Centre
Suite 326
2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Canada
Phone: (416) 439-0130
Fax: (416) 439-5508
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sleep Care Solutions
Suite 302
2025 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-3218
Fax: (416) 292-3200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sleep Care Solutions
Suite 302
2025 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-3218
Fax: (416) 292-3200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sleep Care Solutions
Suite 302
2025 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-3218
Fax: (416) 292-3200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan D. Lowe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lowe ( CPSO# 61298 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Branson Site 2 North
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (647) 984-8882

Business Address:
2100 Ellesmere Road
Suite 326
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 439-0130

Business Address:
2025 Midland Avenue
Suit e302
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (416) 292-3218

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN DAVID LOWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOWE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1993