Lowe, Catherine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 66791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GI Division
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2483
Fax: (613) 544-3114
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Lowe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lowe ( CPSO# 66791 )

Business Address:
City Place 2
John Counter Boulevard
Suite 102
Kingston ON  K7M 8Z6
Phone Number: (613) 549-6000

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH LOWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOWE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1997