Lowe, David Winston Watson (CPSO#: 42457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridlewood Professional Centre
3443 Finch Avenue East
Suite 303
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S1
Phone: (416) 494-8880
Fax: (416) 494-7594
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David W. W. Lowe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lowe ( CPSO# 42457 )

Business Address:
Bridlewood Professional Centre
303 - 3443 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 494-8880

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID WINSTON WATSON LOWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOWE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1991