Lowe, Julia Mary (CPSO#: 88006)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Division of Endocrinology 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 23 Jan 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2017