Lownie, Stephen Patrick Murray (CPSO#: 52459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road P O Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-2927
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Lownie Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lownie ( CPSO# 52459 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-2927

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN PATRICK MURRAY LOWNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOWNIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1985