Lowry, Robert Brian (CPSO#: 47916)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 21 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2001