Lowsky, Robert (CPSO#: 59789)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 13 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2007